Question :

174 * 25 = ?


A) 4350
B) 4375
C) 4524
D) 4600

Answer : A

Description :



Related Questions - 1


12.6 × 3.5 + 6.5 × 12.8 = ?


A) 127.3
B) 647.68
C) 1612.8
D) 171.28

View Answer

Related Questions - 2


627 * 416 = ?


A) 254862
B) 261732
C) 1043
D) 260832

View Answer

Related Questions - 3


910011 × 101 = ?


A) 9191101
B) 91911111
C) 9911111
D) 9100011

View Answer

Related Questions - 4


130 × 110 = ?


A) (100 × 100) + (30 × 10)
B) (150 × 110) + (20 × 110)
C) (100 + 30) × (100 + 100) + (30 × 10)
D) (110 × 110) + (110 × 20)

View Answer

Related Questions - 5


249 × (13 + 12) = ?


A) 3249
B) 3121
C) 6225
D) 5115

View Answer